HI HB1166 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-02 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Adds the mouth and nose of a family or household member to the types of body parts on which pressure that is applied to intentionally or knowingly impede normal breathing or blood circulation shall constitute abuse of a family or household member as a class C felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family or Household Member Abuse; Body Parts; Abuse; Class C Felony

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-02HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
2015-01-29HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2015-01-28HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB574 (Same As) 2015-01-26 - Referred to JDL.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback