HI HB1166 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Marumoto voting no (1) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes job security requirements upon the divestiture of a covered establishment if the covered establishment employs one hundred or more persons. Creates a worker retention tax credit. Effective July 1, 2011. (HB1166 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment; Worker Retention

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-18 (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Marumoto voting no (1) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3).
2011-02-18 (H) Reported from LAB/ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 473) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2011-02-04 (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Brower, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Pine; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Marumoto; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
2011-02-04 (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Souki, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fontaine, Johanson; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2011-02-01 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB/ERB on Friday, 02-04-11 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
2011-01-26 (H) Referred to LAB/ERB, FIN, referral sheet 2
2011-01-26 (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading.
2011-01-25 (H) Pending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback