HI HB116 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB116
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Re-Referred to EET, CPN/WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Re-Referred to EET, CPN/WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Chief Energy Officer of the Hawaii State Energy Office to adopt rules to enforce minimum efficiency standards for certain products and establish or amend appliance efficiency standards in certain situations. Regulates the appliance efficiency standards for portable electric spas. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Energy Efficiency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET, CPN/WAM. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to EET/CPN, WAM. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 31). |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong voting no (1) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 725), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-17 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1). |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 310) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-10 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2021-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-10-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2021-02-04 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 8) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-02-02 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-02-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB116 (Carry Over) 2021-03-12 - Re-Referred to EET, CPN/WAM.