HI HB116 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 206, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1320).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 206, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1320).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the City and County of Honolulu to transfer to the Department of Land and Natural Resources all property upon which certain public high schools are situated. Extends the twenty-first century schools pilot program by an additional five years. (HB116 CD1)
Title
Relating To Public Schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 206, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1320). |
2017-07-13 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 206, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1320). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Oshiro, Tupola voting no (3) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 172). |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 172) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Dela Cruz, K. Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads. |
2017-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Luke; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 2:45PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; K. Rhoads, Dela Cruz Co-Chairs; K. Kahele. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Luke Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 549) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto, Ihara . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1512) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Inouye, Taniguchi, Wakai. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-17 1:40PM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from EDU/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1133) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Inouye, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, L. Thielen. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Dela Cruz, Espero, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-17 3:05PM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to EDU/WTL, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 82). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cachola, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 903), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Choy, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Quinlan, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Tokioka, Ward; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Tupola. |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 567) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-15 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Har, Creagan, Hashem, Ing, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-17 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-17. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision-making on Wednesday, 02-08-17 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2017-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-17. |
2017-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Friday, 02-03-17 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |