HI HB1157 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Act 101, 06/20/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1203).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Act 101, 06/20/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1203).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts students in post-secondary education programs from immunization requirements if they attend classes exclusively online or through distance learning, under certain conditions. (HB1157 CD1)
Title
Relating To Post-secondary Education Student Immunizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | Senate | Act 101, 06/20/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1203). |
2019-06-25 | House | Act 101, on 06/20/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1203). |
2019-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 74). |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 74) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Woodson, B. Kobayashi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Baker, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-19 3:30PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kim Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Kidani, Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Woodson, B. Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 829) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1864) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Fevella. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1333) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE deferred the measure until 03-19-19 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to HRE, CPH. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 260). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1068), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from HLT/LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 407) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Quinlan, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno, Tokioka. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura, Tokioka, Ward. |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/LHE on Friday, 02-08-19 2:15PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT/LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB671 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to HLT/LHE, FIN, referral sheet 27