HI HB1154 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB1154

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-10 - Referred to HHS, JDC.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Part I: Amends the Uniform Probate Code to allow courts to appoint emergency guardians for respondents who reside in psychiatric facilities, hospitals, and homeless shelters. Extends the appointment period. Clarifies that guardians may consent to care, treatment, or service over the objection of wards. Sunsets 1/1/2028. Part II: Requires certain patients subject to emergency hospitalization to be assessed to determine whether a surrogate or guardian is needed to make appropriate health care decisions for the patient. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Guardianship.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-10SenateReferred to HHS, JDC.
2023-03-09SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-03-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 409).
2023-03-07HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Kapela voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2023-03-03HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23.
2023-03-03HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1092) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2023-03-01HouseThe committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama.
2023-02-27HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-01-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-02-17HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
2023-02-17HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 730) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2023-02-15HouseThe committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garcia.
2023-02-08HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-23 11:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-02-08HouseThe committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-23.
2023-02-03HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-08-23 11:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-02-03HouseThe committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-23.
2023-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-03-23 9:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-01-30HouseReferred to HLT, JHA, referral sheet 3
2023-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2023-01-24HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1154 (Carry Over) 2023-03-10 - Referred to HHS, JDC.
SB915 (Same As) 2023-01-27 - Referred to HHS, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback