HI HB1154 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1154
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides scholarships for the unmet need of qualified students at any UH community college campus who meet certain criteria.
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii Promise Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1020 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
HB1154 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 5
HB1154 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1154&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1154_.HTM |