HI HB1152 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Act 029, on 05/19/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1129).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Act 029, on 05/19/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1129).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds to the General Appropriations Act of 2015 a budget proviso to permit the utilization of the Department of Transportation, Airports Division, Project Adjustment Fund. Requires the Governor to report to Legislature prior to the 2018 Regular Session. (HB1152 CD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Transportation, Airports Division, Project Adjustment Fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Act 029, on 05/19/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1129). |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Act 029, 05/19/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1129). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) McKelvey voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, L. Thielen. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 166). |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 166) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Hashem, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-25 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-26-17 10:00AM in conference room 225. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Shimabukuro. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Quinlan Co-Chairs; Hashem, McDermott. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 636) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Tokuda). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-11-17. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-07-17. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1342) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Taniguchi. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 985) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Dela Cruz, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-17 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to TRE, WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 323). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 968) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Choy. |
2017-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3). |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 445), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Hashem, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1018 (Same As) 2017-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.