HI HB1150 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the department of land and natural resources to license non-commercial marine fishing along with freshwater fishing, engage in public outreach prior to implementing the combined non-commercial freshwater and marine fishing license, and submit reports to the legislature. Prohibits enforcement of requirement to obtain a license to catch marine life for non-commercial purposes until 6/1/2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Fishing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04HouseThe committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2021-02-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-26HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback