HI HB1149 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1149

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes an income tax credit for employers who create on-site early childhood facilities. Establishes and appropriates funds for one on-site Early Childhood Facility Coordinator position.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To On-site Childhood Facilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1149 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback