HI HB1149 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1149

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Deposits funds from Environmental Response, Energy, and Food Security Tax Fund into the State Highway Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Environmental Response, Energy, And Food Security Tax.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-30 Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
2017-01-27HouseReferred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 5
2017-01-25HousePass First Reading
2017-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1015 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
HB1149 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 5

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback