HI HB1149 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes Hawaii's controlled substance laws consistent with that of federal law and clarifies sections of chapter 329 relating to controlled substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled Substances

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-11 Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
2009-02-13 (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Pine, Takai excused (2).
2009-02-12 (H) Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 221), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD.
2009-02-09 (H) The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Aquino, Awana, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Rhodes, Saiki, Takumi, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Souki, Yamashita.
2009-02-06 (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-09-09 3:30pm in conference room 309.
2009-02-05 (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
2009-02-02 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-05-09 5:00PM in House conference room 309.
2009-01-30 (H) Referred to PBS, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4
2009-01-28 (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading.
2009-01-26 (H) Pending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB967 (Same As) 2011-01-24 - (S) Referred to HTH, WAM.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback