HI HB1145 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-01 - Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that new income tax credits include a 5-year sunset or a gradual reduction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Tax Credits.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-01HouseReferred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-26HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB662 (Same As) 2021-02-23 - Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 17

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback