HI HB1144 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1144
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Recommitted to FIN with Representative Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no and Representative(s) Matsumoto, Mizuno excused.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Recommitted to FIN with Representative Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no and Representative(s) Matsumoto, Mizuno excused.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts from general excise tax law amounts received from the interisland transportation and related loading and unloading of agricultural commodities. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Recommitted to FIN with Representative Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no and Representative(s) Matsumoto, Mizuno excused. |
2021-03-09 | House | Deferred one day 03-11-21. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 954), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 12:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 630) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-17 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 178) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-02-09 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-09-21 9:15AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1144 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Recommitted to FIN with Representative Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no and Representative(s) Matsumoto, Mizuno excused.
SB1253 (Same As) 2021-02-01 - Referred to AEN/CPN, WAM.
SB1253 (Same As) 2021-02-01 - Referred to AEN/CPN, WAM.