HI HB1138 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1138
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-16 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-16 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the age for minors who are in the presence of abuse of family or household member offenses from less than fourteen to less than eighteen years of age.
Title
Relating To Abuse.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-16-21 2:00PM. |
2021-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-10-21 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-21. |
2021-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-09-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1138 (Carry Over) 2021-02-16 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1138&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB1138_.HTM |