HI HB1136 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1136
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of bonds and appropriates bond funds for the sewage system repair and replacement project and the seawall and pier repair and replacement project of the Hawaii institute of marine biology's facility at Moku o Loe. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Institute Of Marine Biology.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1). |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported from WAL/HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 709) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-08 | House | The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, Quinlan, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Todd, Garcia. |
2023-02-08 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa. |
2023-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/HET on Wednesday, 02-08-23 2:00PM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to WAL/HET, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1136 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1136&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1136_HD1_.HTM |