HI HB1134 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1134
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes procedures for audits of pharmacies conducted by a health care provider, insurance company, third-party payor, sickness insurance provider, mutual benefit society, dental service corporation, health maintenance organization, or any entity that represents such companies or groups.
Title
Relating To Pharmacy Audits.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB975 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB1134 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB1134 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1134&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1134_.HTM |