HI HB1134 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1134
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-01 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-01 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes procedures for audits of pharmacies conducted by a health care provider, insurance company, third-party payor, sickness insurance provider, mutual benefit society, dental service corporation, health maintenance organization, or any entity that represents such companies or groups.
Title
Relating To Pharmacy Audits.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1134 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
SB975 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 21
SB975 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 21
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1134&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB1134_.HTM |