HI HB1133 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Vetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1379).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Vetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1379).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the issuance of more than 40 commercial use permits for any marine life conservation district not accessible by land and limits access by commercial use permittees to no more than 50 percent of permittees. Requires DLNR to immediately initiate rulemaking for Molokini Shoal. (HB1133 CD1)
Title
Relating To Marine Life Conservation Districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Vetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1379). |
2019-07-09 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1379). |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-24-19 (Gov. Msg. No. 1202) |
2019-06-24 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1202) |
2019-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 147). |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 147) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Baker, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, C. Lee, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. |
2019-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 3:30PM in conference room 312. |
2019-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 3:30PM in conference room 312. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 825). |
2019-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 950). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Kahele Chair; Baker, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2019-04-22 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, C. Lee, Todd Co-Chairs; Wildberger, Thielen. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 827) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from CPH/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1909) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kanuha. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-02-19 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL, CPH/WAM. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1221) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to WTL, CPH. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 256). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1148), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 771) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Say; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:01PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 190) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 02-06-19 9:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB999 (Same As) 2019-02-04 - The committee(s) on EET deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-06-19 3:00PM in conference room 414.