HI HB1133 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires DBEDT to conduct a study on the establishment of tax-free zones in Hawaii.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax-Free Zones; DBEDT; Study

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-12-17 Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
2015-02-02HouseReferred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 6
2015-01-28HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2015-01-27HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback