HI HB1133 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-21 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes intentional or knowing performance of a veterinary procedure on a pet animal by an unlicensed person a class C felony. Clarifies that the cropping of ears or the docking of a tail of a pet animal is exempt from criminal penalties for animal cruelty only if performed by a licensed veterinarian. Effective January 7, 2059. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterinary Medicine; Unlawful

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-21 (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
2011-03-21 (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 810) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL.
2011-03-15 (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Green, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Solomon.
2011-03-11 (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-11 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2011-03-10 (S) Referred to CPN, JDL.
2011-03-10 (S) Passed First Reading.
2011-03-10 (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 273).
2011-03-08 (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2011-03-04 (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11.
2011-03-04 (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 816) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2011-03-01 (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Ito, Luke, B. Oshiro, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Souki; Noes: none; and 7 Excused: Representative(s) Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey, Morita.
2011-02-24 (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-01-11 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2011-02-24 (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 03-01-11.
2011-02-22 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-24-11 2:15PM in House conference room 325.
2011-02-17 (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Chong, Nakashima excused (2).
2011-02-17 (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 398) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2011-02-09 (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Herkes, Yamane, Carroll, Keith-Agaran, Luke, McKelvey, Morita, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Brower, Cabanilla, Ito, Ching, Thielen.
2011-02-04 (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-09-11 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2011-02-02 (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
2011-01-28 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-02-11 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2011-01-26 (H) Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 2
2011-01-26 (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading.
2011-01-24 (H) Pending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback