HI HB1130 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-26 - The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the office of planning to hire a contractor to, among other things, identify and assess alternative financing, project delivery, and cost recovery mechanisms to recapture the State's upfront investment in transit-oriented development infrastructure. Requires the contractor to consult with representatives of certain government entities. Requires the office of planning to report its findings to the legislature. Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Transit-oriented Development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-26HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
2021-02-23HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-26-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-18HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
2021-02-18HouseReported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 432) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2021-02-16HouseThe committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno.
2021-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-16-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-12HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
2021-02-12HouseReported from TRN/HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 209) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
2021-02-10HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, DeCoite, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-02-10HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-02-05HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN/HSG on Wednesday, 02-10-21 11:30AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to TRN/HSG, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-26HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB986 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to WTL/EET, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback