HI HB1127 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1127
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the standard deduction amounts for taxpayers for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2022. Requires biannual increases to the standard deduction amounts to match any increase in the Consumer Price Index for All Urban Consumers for Honolulu over the most recent two year period.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Rep. Terez Amato [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] |
Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1127 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1127&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB1127_.HTM |