HI HB1124 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB1124

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the minimum classroom instruction time for state certified or National Rifle Association certified firearm safety courses from four to fourteen hours. Requires firearm safety courses to include additional subject matter. Requires applicants for a license to carry a concealed firearm to pass a written test, participate in an in person interview, and provide information to demonstrate that the applicant is of good moral character and sufficient mental competence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Firearms.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-30HouseReferred to JHA, referral sheet 3
2023-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2023-01-24HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1124 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3
SB882 (Same As) 2023-02-10 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback