HI HB1122 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1122
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defines "beneficiary consultation". Prohibits the department of Hawaiian home lands from disposing or extending a general lease to non-beneficiaries unless there are no applicants seeking to enter into a general lease to the use and occupancy of a tract of Hawaiian home lands. Requires the department to notify beneficiaries through beneficiary consultation prior to the disposition of Hawaiian home lands. Adds language to require Section 204 lessees mandate Homestead Beneficiary Agreements. Prohibits the department from establishing additional criteria to enter into a general lease with an applicant, under certain conditions. Specifies that the department may grant a license or enter into a general lease, under certain conditions. Allocates the interest or other earnings from the Hawaiian home loan fund and Hawaiian home general loan fund into their respective funds, under certain conditions. Requires the department to submit a quarterly report to the legislature and beneficiaries. Authorizes the department to negotiate with homestead association governed water agencies to maintain water systems prior to other service providers, under certain conditions. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaiian Homes Commission Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1025) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Acasio, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Keohokalole ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-16-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to HWN, WAM/JDC. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 289). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Branco, DeCoite, Gates, Har, Holt, Ilagan, Okimoto, Quinlan, Sayama, Todd voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 952), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Holt; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 12:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Holt voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 580), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-17 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Takumi. |
2021-02-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 183) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-09 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ganaden, B. Kobayashi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-09-21 9:15AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1122 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
SB892 (Same As) 2021-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
SB892 (Same As) 2021-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.