HI HB1122 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1122
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DLNR to administer State wildlife and wildlife resources using cooperative resource management strategies. Prohibits closures of certain game, sanctuary, and hunting areas unless DLNR makes findings based on scientific data and notifies the Game Management Advisory Commission. (HB1122 HD1)
Title
Relating To Land Use.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 613) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 02-13-19 11:15AM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 02-13-19 11:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1122 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Subjects
Closures
Cooperative Resource Management
DLNR
Game Management Areas
Public Hunting Area
Wildlife Sanctuary
Cooperative Resource Management
DLNR
Game Management Areas
Public Hunting Area
Wildlife Sanctuary