HI HB1118 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1118
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-27 - Referred to LAB/HLT, CPC, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-27 - Referred to LAB/HLT, CPC, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "physician" in workers' compensation law to include advanced practice registered nurses.
Title
Relating To Workers' Compensation Physician.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB/HLT, CPC, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1118 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to LAB/HLT, CPC, referral sheet 5
SB984 (Same As) 2017-07-11 - Act 153, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1254).
SB984 (Same As) 2017-07-11 - Act 153, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1254).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1118&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB1118_.HTM |