HI HB1118 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts qualifying high-rise dwelling projects with affordable rental units in the urban core of Honolulu from height restrictions.
Title
Affordable Housing; Rental Units; Honolulu Urban Core
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 02-04-13 8:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to HSG, WAL, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1118&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HB1118_.HTM |