HI HB1116 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Notwithstanding section 673-3, Hawaii Revised Statutes, authorizes Hawaii Public Housing Authority to process terminations of tenancy or evictions from the federal low-income public housing program without providing a grievance hearing when permitted by the federal government. (HB1116 HD1)
Title
Hawaii Public Housing Authority; Termination and Eviction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4). |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 289) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-04 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Kobayashi, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Woodson, Morikawa; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Jordan. |
2013-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 02-04-13 8:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to HSG, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |