HI HB1113 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1113
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a department of civil service for the office of Hawaiian affairs to apply merit-based hiring practices to future office of Hawaiian affairs employees; permits employees of the office of Hawaiian affairs to enter into collective bargaining agreements. Confers all existing employees of the office of Hawaiian affairs permanent civil service status and specifies that any rights, benefits, and privileges they have accrued shall not be diminished by transitioning to their collective bargaining unit.
Title
Relating To The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB731 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB1113 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1113 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1113&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1113_.HTM |