HI HB1111 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1111
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-01 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-01 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the use of monetary bail and requires defendants to be released on their own recognizance for traffic offenses, violations, and nonviolent petty misdemeanor and misdemeanor offenses, with certain exceptions. Creates rebuttable presumptions regarding release and detention for certain offenses and specifies circumstances in which these presumptions apply.
Title
Relating To Criminal Pretrial Reform.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1111 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
SB1260 (Same As) 2021-04-20 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-21 3:00PM; CR 325.
SB1260 (Same As) 2021-04-20 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-21 3:00PM; CR 325.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1111&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB1111_.HTM |