HI HB111 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB111
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of fossil fuels for electricity generation or storage after 12/31/2045. Prohibits the Public Utilities Commission from approving cost recovery of any application or proposal for generation or storage facilities that use fossil fuels, with certain exceptions. Exempts emergency generators. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Renewable Energy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-21 3:30PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET, CPN/WAM. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to EET/CPN, WAM. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 30). |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Kong, McDermott, Tokioka, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 724), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-17 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1). |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 309) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-10 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kong; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-10-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2021-02-04 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 5) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-02-02 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-02-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB111 (Carry Over) 2021-03-19 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
SB931 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
SB931 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
Subjects
Emergency Generators
Fossil Fuels
Prohibition
Public Utilities Commission
Renewable Energy Generation
Storage
Fossil Fuels
Prohibition
Public Utilities Commission
Renewable Energy Generation
Storage