HI HB1109 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1109

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, JUD, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies the authority of law enforcement officers or commissioned volunteer enforcement officers to confiscate disability parking permits that are used unlawfully. Specifies that the sale or purchase of a disability parking permit is a misdemeanor. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Parking For Disabled Persons.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-17HouseRe-referred to HHS, JUD, referral sheet 1
2017-11-30 Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
2017-02-09HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
2017-02-09HouseReported from HLT/HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 155) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2017-02-02HouseThe committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Belatti, Har, Kobayashi, Oshiro, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2017-02-02HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Har, Morikawa, Oshiro, Todd, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2017-01-31HouseBroadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2017-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HUS on Thursday, 02-02-17 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2017-01-27HouseReferred to HLT/HUS, JUD, referral sheet 5
2017-01-25HousePass First Reading
2017-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB975 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, JUD, referral sheet 1
HB1109 (Carry Over) 2017-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback