HI HB1107 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a task force to examine and make recommendations on policy issues regarding the benefits and harms of online gaming. (HB1107 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Gaming.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
2019-02-08HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 236) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-02-07HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane, Thielen.
2019-02-05HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-07-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to JUD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-23HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback