HI HB1103 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1103
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an implementation board to review, investigate, and study the feasibility of establishing a state-owned bank. Requires a report to the legislature prior to the regular session of 2022.
Title
Relating To Public Banking.
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] |
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1103 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1103&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1103_.HTM |