HI HB1103 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1103
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Agriculture for the pesticide subsidy program to help eradicate the coffee berry borer. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Pesticide Subsidy Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1228) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-19 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 100). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 846), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Todd. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 589) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-12-19 4:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 84) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-01-19 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to AGR, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1103 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.