HI HB1101 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1101
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-27 - Referred to HSG, JUD, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-27 - Referred to HSG, JUD, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that certain areas within Hawaii Public Housing Authority housing projects are closed to the public and amends criminal trespass in the second degree to permit the prosecution of an unauthorized entry or a violation of a written prohibition to enter into the subject housing projects. Clarifies requirements for signage notifying trespassers of illegal entry.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Public Housing Authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to HSG, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1101 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to HSG, JUD, referral sheet 5
SB967 (Same As) 2017-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
SB967 (Same As) 2017-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1101&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB1101_.HTM |