HI HB1099 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1099
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Sheriff Division's specialized canine unit to assist in the random inspection of fireworks shipments into the State.
Title
Relating To Fireworks.
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] |
Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 02-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to PVM, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1099 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1099&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1099_.HTM |