HI HB1097 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Act 162, 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1265).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Act 162, 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1265).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates the Uniform Controlled Substances Act by adding substances scheduled under federal law. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Uniform Controlled Substances Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Senate | Act 162, 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1265). |
2023-06-30 | House | Act 162, on 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1265). |
2023-04-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 890). |
2023-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden excused (1). |
2023-04-27 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 875). |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 871). |
2023-04-25 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 03-31-23. |
2023-04-25 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 837). |
2023-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Tarnas Co-Chairs; Takayama, Garcia. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 512). |
2023-03-31 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2023-03-30 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 524) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Fukunaga, Richards). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-30-23. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1426) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2023-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Awa. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 399). |
2023-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1081) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-23 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden. |
2023-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-23-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1). |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 700) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2023-02-15 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garcia. |
2023-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-23 11:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-23. |
2023-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-08-23 11:40AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-23. |
2023-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Saturday, 02-04-23 9:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HLT, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1395 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to JDC.