HI HB1092 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the photo red light imaging detector systems program, effective 7/1/2020. Authorizes counties to administer the program. Establishes the photo red light imaging detector systems program special fund. Requires fines collected for violations on a county highway to be expended for the establishment, operation, management, and maintenance of the program in the county from which the fines were collected. Appropriates funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Highway Safety.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-28HouseReferred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-23HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback