HI HB1092 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes income received from deferred compensation retirement plans from the state income tax for taxpayers who meet certain income requirements. (HB1092 HD1)
Title
Deferred Compensation Retirement Plans; Income Tax Exclusion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 273). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Rhoads voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Souki excused (2). |
2015-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 596) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-18 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pouha. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-18-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-27 | House | Pending introduction. |