HI HB1090 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB1090

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for the establishment of a statewide governance system that includes an interoperability executive board to set the overarching policy, guidance, and direction for statewide interoperable public safety communications. Provides a mechanism to ensure timely funding of public safety interoperable communications systems by authorizing surcharges on various motor vehicle citations and criminal penalties to be deposited into a statewide interoperable public safety communications trust fund which can then be used to pay for, or offset costs of, public safety telecommunications systems and, if identified necessary, human resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Statewide Interoperable Public Safety Communications.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-30 Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
2017-01-27HouseReferred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
2017-01-25HousePass First Reading
2017-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB956 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
HB1090 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback