HI HB1090 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Act 158, on 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1259).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits noncompete and nonsolicit clauses in employment contracts relating to employees of a technology business. (HB1090 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Technology Businesses; Employment Covenants or Agreements; Noncompete Clause; Nonsolicit Clause

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-01HouseAct 158, on 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1259).
2015-07-01SenateAct 158, 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1259).
2015-05-06HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2015-05-07SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680).
2015-05-05HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699).
2015-05-05HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har voting no (1) and none excused (0).
2015-05-05SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2015-04-30Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15.
2015-04-30SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 10).
2015-04-30HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-05-15.
2015-04-30HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 10) as amended in (CD 1).
2015-04-28SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Baker, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran.
2015-04-28HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, McKelvey, Rhoads, Kong, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
2015-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-28-15 10:00AM in conference room 423.
2015-04-22HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-24-15 10:00AM in conference room 423.
2015-04-20HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641).
2015-04-20SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Baker, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Galuteria, Slom.
2015-04-20SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617).
2015-04-20HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Kawakami, McKelvey, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Kong, Takayama, Ward.
2015-04-20HouseRe-referred to EDB, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 53
2015-04-08SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 348).
2015-04-07HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2015-04-06HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 403) in amended form (SD 2).
2015-04-06SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2015-04-02Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-15.
2015-04-02SenateReported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1291) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2015-03-31SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero.
2015-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-15 9:35AM in conference room 016.
2015-03-27SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
2015-03-27SenateReported from EDT/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1112) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL.
2015-03-16SenateThe committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Baker, Espero, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz.
2015-03-16SenateThe committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kahele, Kidani, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi.
2015-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on EDT/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-15 3:00PM in conference room 016.
2015-03-12SenateReferred to EDT/CPN, JDL.
2015-03-12SenatePassed First Reading.
2015-03-12SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 271).
2015-03-10HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Jordan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2015-03-06HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15.
2015-03-06HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 758) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2015-03-02HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Nakashima, Yamane, McDermott.
2015-02-27HouseBroadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2015-02-25HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-02-15 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2015-02-25HouseThe committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-02-15.
2015-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-25-15 2:30PM in House conference room 325.
2015-02-20HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1).
2015-02-20HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 393) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2015-02-17HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Woodson.
2015-02-13HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-17-15 9:00AM in conference room 312.
2015-02-13HouseThe committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-17-15.
2015-02-10HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-13-15 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
2015-02-02HouseReferred to EDB, CPC, referral sheet 6
2015-01-28HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2015-01-27HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1279 (Same As) 2015-04-06 - The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback