HI HB1090 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - (S) Referred to JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the fuel tax law to clarify that the entire fuel tax return is a public record available for public inspection. Effective July 1, 2030. (HB1090 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Administration; Fuel Tax

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-10 (S) Referred to JDL, WAM.
2011-03-10 (S) Passed First Reading.
2011-03-10 (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 258).
2011-03-08 (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Marumoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2011-03-04 (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11.
2011-03-04 (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 892) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2011-03-01 (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2011-02-25 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-11 1:00PM in House conference room 308.
2011-02-07 (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2011-02-07 (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 58), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2011-02-02 (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, Saiki, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee, Luke.
2011-01-28 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-02-11 8:30AM in House conference room 309.
2011-01-26 (H) Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 2
2011-01-26 (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading.
2011-01-24 (H) Pending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1317 (Same As) 2011-01-26 - (S) Referred to JDL, WAM.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback