HI HB1090 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes affordable housing receiving zones to encourage the development of affordable housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hawaii Affordable Housing Receiving Zones

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-11 Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
2009-01-30 (H) Referred to HSG/WLO, FIN, referral sheet 4
2009-01-28 (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading.
2009-01-26 (H) Pending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB908 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback