HI HB1079 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1079
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-01 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-01 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the use of monetary bail, with certain exceptions, and requires defendants to be released on their own recognizance for traffic offenses, violations, non-violent petty misdemeanor offenses, and non-violent misdemeanor offenses. Creates a rebuttable presumption regarding both release and detention for certain offenses and specifies circumstances in which these presumptions apply. Requires the judicial council to appoint a committee to review and recommend changes to the Hawaii penal code.
Title
Relating To The Modernization Of Criminal Justice.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1079 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
SB1244 (Same As) 2021-02-23 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
SB1244 (Same As) 2021-02-23 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1079&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB1079_.HTM |