HI HB1078 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1078

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Governor to issue an executive order for the State to obtain Old Stadium Park on Oahu from the City and County of Honolulu and place that property under the authority and control of the Stadium Authority for the purposes of developing a new stadium on Oahu.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Stadium Authority.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1078 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 6

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback