HI HB1071 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1071
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the requirement to transfer the Oahu Regional Health care system in its entirety from the Hawaii Health Systems Corporation to the Department of Health.
Title
Relating To The Repeal Of Act 212, Session Laws Of Hawaii 2021, As Amended By Act 150, Session Laws Of Hawaii 2022.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to LGO/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1071 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to LGO/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3
SB1369 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB1369 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1071&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1071_.HTM |