HI HB1067 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1067
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Act 317, Session Laws of Hawaii 2022, to give the Department of Human Services needed flexibility in developing a comprehensive child welfare information system that complies with federal regulation, which may allow the department to receive federal matching funds for the project. Extends the time the Department of Human Services may expend the appropriation made in Act 317, Session Laws of Hawaii 2022.
Title
Relating To Act 317, Session Laws Of Hawaii 2022.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1067 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3
SB1365 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB1365 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1067&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1067_.HTM |