HI HB1064 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1064
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that real estate investment trusts file returns reporting their shareholders' pro rata shares of net income and net income attributable to this State. Provides for composite returns and requires withholding for those shareholders who do not agree to file returns or pay tax on their pro rata share of net income attributable to this State.
Title
Relating To Real Estate Investment Trust Funds.
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to EDB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1064 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to EDB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1064&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1064_.HTM |